Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/22/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/24/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/29/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/13/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/13/2008
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/14/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/19/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/22/2008
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 06/26/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/26/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/26/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/15/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/15/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/19/2008