Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 01/19/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 01/22/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 01/22/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 01/22/2007
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 01/31/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/06/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 02/06/2007
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 02/06/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/06/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 02/06/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/06/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 02/06/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/07/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/07/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/14/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 02/14/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/14/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 02/16/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/16/2007