Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/24/2008
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/24/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/24/2008
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 07/24/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/28/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/28/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 08/01/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 08/01/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/15/2008