Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 04/22/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 04/22/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 04/25/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 04/29/2008
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 05/07/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/08/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/08/2008