Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 04/22/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/24/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/30/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/07/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/07/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/19/2008