There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 36, United States Code, to grant a Federal charter to the Military Officers Association of America, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/17/2008Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
04/28/2008Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration, Citizenship, Refugees, Border Security, and International Law.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/17/2008Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/17/2008Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (66)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 04/24/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/29/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/29/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/29/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 04/30/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/01/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 05/01/2008
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/05/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/07/2008
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 05/07/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/07/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/07/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/07/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 05/07/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/08/2008
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 05/13/2008
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/13/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 05/19/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/19/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/21/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/21/2008
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/22/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/22/2008
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/04/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/04/2008
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 06/04/2008
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 06/04/2008
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 06/04/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/04/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/12/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/12/2008
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/17/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/17/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/17/2008
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/17/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/19/2008
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/19/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/24/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/24/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/08/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/08/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/22/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/22/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/23/2008
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/31/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/08/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 09/08/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/08/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/08/2008
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/08/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/08/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/08/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/08/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/08/2008
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/08/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/10/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 09/10/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/10/2008
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 09/10/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/10/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/17/2008
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/17/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 09/23/2008
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/23/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 09/23/2008

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary04/17/2008 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration, Citizenship, Refugees, Border Security, and International Law04/28/2008 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5854. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/17/2008)

Grants a federal charter to the Military Officers Association of America (a nonprofit corporation and incorporated under the laws of the Commonwealth of Virginia).