Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 04/24/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/29/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/29/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/29/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 04/30/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/01/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 05/01/2008
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/05/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/07/2008
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 05/07/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/07/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/07/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/07/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 05/07/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/08/2008
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 05/13/2008
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/13/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 05/19/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/19/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/21/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/21/2008
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/22/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/22/2008
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/04/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/04/2008
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 06/04/2008
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 06/04/2008
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 06/04/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/04/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/12/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/12/2008
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/17/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/17/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/17/2008
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/17/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/19/2008
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/19/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/24/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/24/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/08/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/08/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/22/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/22/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/23/2008
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/31/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/08/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 09/08/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/08/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/08/2008
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/08/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/08/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/08/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/08/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/08/2008
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/08/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/10/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 09/10/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/10/2008
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 09/10/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/10/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/17/2008
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/17/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 09/23/2008
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/23/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 09/23/2008