Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 04/22/2008
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 04/22/2008
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 04/22/2008
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 04/22/2008
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 04/22/2008
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 04/22/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 04/22/2008
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 04/22/2008
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 04/22/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/22/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 04/22/2008
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 04/22/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/22/2008
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 04/22/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 04/22/2008
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 04/22/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 04/22/2008
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 04/22/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 04/22/2008
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 04/22/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 04/22/2008
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 04/22/2008
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 04/22/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 04/22/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 04/22/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 04/22/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 04/22/2008
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 04/22/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 04/22/2008
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 04/22/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 04/22/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 04/22/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/23/2008
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/23/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 04/23/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/23/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/23/2008
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 04/23/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/23/2008
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/23/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 04/24/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/24/2008
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 05/01/2008
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/05/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 05/05/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/05/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 05/05/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 05/07/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 05/07/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/07/2008
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/07/2008
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/07/2008
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 05/07/2008
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 05/08/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/14/2008
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 05/14/2008
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 05/14/2008
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/16/2008
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/20/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/22/2008