Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/19/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/19/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/19/2008
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/22/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/03/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/15/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/09/2008