Refine your search

7 results for Major Actions
Date Major Actions
10/08/2008 Became Public Law No: 110-363.
10/08/2008 Signed by President.
09/30/2008 Presented to President.
09/27/2008 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
09/27/2008 Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9901)
05/15/2008 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 403 - 8 (Roll no. 327).(text: CR 5/13/2008 H3724-3725)
04/22/2008 Introduced in House