Text: H.R.5872 — 110th Congress (2007-2008)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 110-363 (10/08/2008)

 
[110th Congress Public Law 363]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]


[DOCID: f:publ363.110]

[[Page 122 STAT. 4015]]

Public Law 110-363
110th Congress

                                 An Act


 
To require the Secretary of the Treasury to mint coins in commemoration 
     of the centennial of the Boy Scouts of America, and for other 
            purposes. <<NOTE: Oct. 8, 2008 -  [H.R. 5872]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled, <<NOTE: Boy Scouts 
of America Centennial Commemorative Coin Act. 31 USC 5112 note.>> 
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE.

    This Act may be cited as the ``Boy Scouts of America Centennial 
Commemorative Coin Act''.
SEC. 2. FINDINGS.

    The Congress finds as follows:
            (1) The Boy Scouts of America will celebrate its centennial 
        on February 8, 2010.
            (2) The Boy Scouts of America is the largest youth 
        organization in the United States, with 3,000,000 youth members 
        and 1,000,000 adult leaders in the traditional programs of Cub 
        Scouts, Boy Scouts, and Venturing.
            (3) Since 1910, more than 111,000,000 youth have 
        participated in Scouting's traditional programs.
            (4) The Boy Scouts of America was granted a Federal charter 
        in 1916 by an Act of the 64th Congress which was signed into law 
        by President Woodrow Wilson.
            (5) In the 110th Congress, 248 members of the House of 
        Representative and the Senate have participated in Boy Scouts of 
        America as Scouts or adult leaders.
            (6) The mission of the Boy Scouts of America is ``to prepare 
        young people to make ethical and moral choices over their 
        lifetimes by instilling in them the values of the Scout Oath and 
        Law''.
            (7) Every day across our Nation, Scouts and their leaders 
        pledge to live up the promise in the Scout Oath--``On my honor I 
        will do my best, To do my duty to God and my country and to obey 
        the Scout Law; To help other people at all times; To keep myself 
        physically strong, mentally awake, and morally straight''--and 
        the Scout Law, according to which a Scout is ``Trustworthy, 
        Loyal, Helpful, Friendly, Courteous, Kind, Obedient, Cheerful, 
        Thrifty, Brave, Clean, and Reverent''.
            (8) In the past 4 years alone, Scouting youth and their 
        leaders have volunteered more than 6,500,000 hours of service to 
        their communities through more than 75,000 service projects, 
        benefiting food banks, local schools, and civic organizations.

[[Page 122 STAT. 4016]]

SEC. 3. COIN SPECIFICATIONS.

    (a) $1 Silver Coins.--The Secretary of the Treasury (hereafter in 
this Act referred to as the ``Secretary'') shall mint and issue not more 
than 350,000 $1 coins in commemoration of the centennial of the founding 
of the Boy Scouts of America, each of which shall--
            (1) weigh 26.73 grams;
            (2) have a diameter of 1.500 inches; and
            (3) contain 90 percent silver and 10 percent copper.

    (b) Legal Tender.--The coins minted under this Act shall be legal 
tender, as provided in section 5103 of title 31, United States Code.
    (c) Numismatic Items.--For purposes of sections 5134 and 5136 of 
title 31, United States Code, all coins minted under this Act shall be 
considered to be numismatic items.
SEC. 4. DESIGN OF COINS.

    (a) Design Requirements.--
            (1) In general.--The design of the coins minted under this 
        Act shall be emblematic of the 100 years of the largest youth 
        organization in United States, the Boy Scouts of America.
            (2) Designation and inscriptions.--On each coin minted under 
        this Act, there shall be--
                    (A) a designation of the value of the coin;
                    (B) an inscription of the year ``2010''; and
                    (C) inscriptions of the words ``Liberty'', ``In God 
                We Trust'', ``United States of America'', and ``E 
                Pluribus Unum''.

    (b) Selection.--The design for the coins minted under this Act shall 
be--
            (1) selected by the Secretary, after consultation with the 
        Chief Scout Executive of the Boy Scouts of America and the 
        Commission of Fine Arts; and
            (2) reviewed by the Citizens Coinage Advisory Committee.
SEC. 5. ISSUANCE OF COINS.

    (a) Quality of Coins.--Coins minted under this Act shall be issued 
in uncirculated and proof qualities.
    (b) Mint Facility.--Only 1 facility of the United States Mint may be 
used to strike any particular quality of the coins minted under this 
Act.
    (c) Period for Issuance.--The Secretary may issue coins under this 
Act only on or after February 8, 2010, and before January 1, 2011.
SEC. 6. SALE OF COINS.

    (a) Sale Price.--The coins issued under this Act shall be sold by 
the Secretary at a price equal to the sum of--
            (1) the face value of the coins;
            (2) the surcharge provided in section 7 with respect to such 
        coins; and
            (3) the cost of designing and issuing the coins (including 
        labor, materials, dies, use of machinery, overhead expenses, 
        marketing, and shipping).

    (b) Bulk Sales.--The Secretary shall make bulk sales of the coins 
issued under this Act at a reasonable discount.
    (c) Prepaid Orders.--

[[Page 122 STAT. 4017]]

            (1) In general.--The Secretary shall accept prepaid orders 
        for the coins minted under this Act before the issuance of such 
        coins.
            (2) Discount.--Sale prices with respect to prepaid orders 
        under paragraph (1) shall be at a reasonable discount.
SEC. 7. SURCHARGES.

    (a) In General.--All sales of coins issued under this Act shall 
include a surcharge of $10 per coin.
    (b) Distribution.--Subject to section 5134(f) of title 31, United 
States Code, all surcharges received by the Secretary from the sale of 
coins issued under this Act shall be paid to the National Boy Scouts of 
America Foundation, which funds will be made available to local councils 
in the form of grants for the extension of Scouting in hard to serve 
areas.
    (c) Audits.--The Comptroller General of the United States shall have 
the right to examine such books, records, documents, and other data of 
the National Boy Scouts of America Foundation as may be related to the 
expenditures of amounts paid under subsection (b).
    (d) Limitation.--Notwithstanding subsection (a), no surcharge may be 
included with respect to the issuance under this Act of any coin during 
a calendar year if, as of the time of such issuance, the issuance of 
such coin would result in the number of commemorative coin programs 
issued during such year to exceed the annual 2 commemorative coin 
program issuance limitation under section 5112(m)(1) of title 31, United 
States Code (as in effect on the date of the enactment of this Act). The 
Secretary of the Treasury may issue guidance to carry out this 
subsection.

    Approved October 8, 2008.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--H.R. 5872:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 154 (2008):
            May 13, 15, considered and passed House.
            Sept. 27, considered and passed Senate.

                                  <all>