Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 04/22/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/13/2008
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/13/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/13/2008
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/13/2008
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/13/2008
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/13/2008
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 05/19/2008
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/19/2008
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/19/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/19/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/19/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/19/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/19/2008
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/19/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 05/19/2008
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/19/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/19/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/19/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/20/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/21/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/03/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/03/2008
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/03/2008
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/09/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/09/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/09/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/09/2008
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 06/09/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/09/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/09/2008
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/11/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/11/2008
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/11/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/11/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/20/2008
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/24/2008
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 06/25/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/26/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/26/2008
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/26/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/29/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/29/2008