Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 04/23/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/06/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/08/2008
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/21/2008
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 06/17/2008
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/26/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/27/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/27/2008