Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 04/30/2008
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 04/30/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/30/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 05/01/2008
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 05/06/2008
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 05/07/2008
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 05/07/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/07/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/07/2008
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 05/07/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/07/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/07/2008
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/07/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/07/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/07/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 05/07/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/07/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/07/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/07/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/07/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/07/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/13/2008
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/13/2008
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/13/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/13/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/13/2008
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 05/13/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/13/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/15/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 05/15/2008
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/20/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/21/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/21/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/21/2008
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/04/2008
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/04/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/04/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/05/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/05/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 06/05/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/10/2008
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/10/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/10/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/10/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/10/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/10/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/11/2008
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 06/11/2008
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 06/18/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/24/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/24/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/24/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/25/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/25/2008
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/09/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/09/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/09/2008
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/09/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/10/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/14/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/15/2008
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 07/23/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 07/23/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/23/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/24/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 07/24/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/29/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 07/29/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/29/2008
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/29/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/29/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/29/2008
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/29/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/29/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/29/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/29/2008
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/29/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/29/2008