Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/30/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/30/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/30/2008
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/30/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/30/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/06/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/13/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/04/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/23/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/22/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/22/2008