Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/01/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/01/2008
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 05/01/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 05/01/2008
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 05/01/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/01/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/01/2008
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 05/01/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/01/2008
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/01/2008
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/01/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/01/2008
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/01/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/05/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 05/06/2008
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 05/06/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/07/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/07/2008
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/07/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/07/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/07/2008
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 05/07/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 05/07/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/07/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/07/2008
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 05/07/2008
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 05/07/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 05/07/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/08/2008
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45] 05/08/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/08/2008
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/08/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/13/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/13/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/13/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 05/14/2008
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 05/15/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 05/15/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/15/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/15/2008
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/15/2008
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 05/19/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/19/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/19/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/20/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/20/2008
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/20/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 05/20/2008
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 05/20/2008
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/20/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/20/2008
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/20/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/22/2008
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/22/2008
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/22/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 05/22/2008
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/22/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/22/2008
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 06/03/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/03/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/03/2008
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 06/03/2008
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/03/2008
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 06/04/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/04/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 06/04/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/04/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 06/04/2008
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 06/04/2008
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 06/04/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/04/2008
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/04/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/04/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/04/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/04/2008
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 06/04/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/05/2008
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/05/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/05/2008
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/05/2008
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 06/05/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/11/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/17/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/19/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/26/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/26/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/14/2008
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/29/2008