Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 04/24/2008
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 04/24/2008
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 04/24/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/24/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/05/2008
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 05/05/2008
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 05/12/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/20/2008
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 05/20/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/22/2008
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 07/22/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/26/2008