Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/30/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/30/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/30/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/30/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/30/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/30/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/30/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/01/2008
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 05/05/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/12/2008
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/18/2008