Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/01/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/01/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/01/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/19/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/19/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 05/19/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/22/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/25/2008
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/25/2008
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/08/2008