Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 04/30/2008
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 04/30/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 04/30/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 04/30/2008
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 04/30/2008
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 04/30/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 04/30/2008
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 04/30/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 04/30/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 04/30/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/15/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/15/2008
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/20/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/20/2008
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 05/20/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/21/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/21/2008
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 05/21/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/05/2008
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/10/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/11/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/12/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/12/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/12/2008
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 06/12/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/17/2008
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/20/2008
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 06/24/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 06/24/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 06/25/2008
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/15/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/29/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/11/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 12/09/2008