There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To facilitate the preservation of certain affordable housing dwelling units.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
05/07/2008Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 345 - 73 (Roll no. 277).(text: CR 5/6/2008 H3093-3094)
05/01/2008Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
05/08/2008SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
05/07/2008-3:04pmHouseOn motion to table the motion to reconsider the vote Agreed to by recorded vote: 225 - 190 (Roll no. 278).
05/07/2008-2:57pmHouseMr. Welch (VT) moved to table the motion to reconsider the vote (consideration: CR H3133)
05/07/2008-2:57pmHouseMr. Simpson moved to reconsider the vote.
05/07/2008-2:56pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 345 - 73 (Roll no. 277). (text: CR 5/6/2008 H3093-3094)
05/07/2008-2:47pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3132-3133)
05/06/2008-5:52pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Culberson objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
05/06/2008-5:35pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5937.
05/06/2008-5:35pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3093-3096)
05/06/2008-5:34pmHouseMr. Meeks (NY) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
05/01/2008HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
05/01/2008HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 05/01/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/01/2008
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 05/01/2008
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 05/01/2008

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services05/01/2008 Referred to
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs05/08/2008 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5937.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.5937. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (05/07/2008)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Authorizes the Secretary of Housing and Urban Development (HUD), upon request of the owner of a multifamily housing project to which specified contracts are subject, to: (1) convert such contracts to a contract for project-based rental assistance under section 8 of the United States Housing Act of 1937; and (2) treat the contemplated resulting contract as eligible for initial renewal under the Multifamily Assisted Housing Reform and Affordability Act of 1997, if certain conditions are met.

Deems the owner to be in compliance with income-targeting requirements of the United States Housing Act of 1937 by serving low-income families.

Considers each family residing in an assisted dwelling unit on the date of such conversion to meet the applicable requirements for income eligibility and occupancy.