There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (8)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted for portions of this bill
  • Former Vice President Protection Act of 2008
  • Identity Theft Enforcement and Restitution Act of 2008

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Former Vice President Protection Act of 2008

Short Titles as Reported to House

Former Vice President Protection Act of 2008

Short Titles as Introduced

Former Vice President Protection Act of 2008

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate for portions of this bill
  • Former Vice President Protection Act of 2008
  • Identity Theft Enforcement and Restitution Act of 2008

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 18, United States Code, to provide secret service protection to former Vice Presidents, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (9)

Date
09/26/2008Became Public Law No: 110-326. (TXT | PDF)
09/26/2008Signed by President.
09/17/2008Presented to President.
09/15/2008Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to by voice vote.(text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H8075-8076)
07/30/2008Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent.
07/30/2008Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
06/09/2008Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5063)
06/05/2008Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 110-696.
05/01/2008Introduced in House

All Actions (31)

Date Chamber
09/26/2008Became Public Law No: 110-326. (TXT | PDF)
09/26/2008Signed by President.
09/17/2008HousePresented to President.
09/15/2008-6:14pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/15/2008-6:14pmHouseOn motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to by voice vote. (text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H8075-8076)
09/15/2008-6:12pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8094)
09/15/2008-4:48pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Issa objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
09/15/2008-4:31pmHouseThe House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5938.
09/15/2008-4:30pmHouseMr. Scott (VA) moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments. (consideration: CR H8075-8078)
07/31/2008SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/30/2008SenatePassed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent.
07/30/2008SenateS.Amdt.5257 Amendment SA 5257 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
07/30/2008SenateS.Amdt.5257 Amendment SA 5257 proposed by Senator Pryor for Senator Leahy. (consideration: CR S7797-7798; text: CR S7797-7798) To amend title 18, United States Code, to enable increased federal prosecution of identity theft crimes and to allow for restitution to victims of identity theft.
07/30/2008SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7797-7798)
07/30/2008SenateSenate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
06/10/2008SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
06/09/2008-3:53pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/09/2008-3:53pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5063)
06/09/2008-3:49pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5938.
06/09/2008-3:49pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5063-5064)
06/09/2008-3:48pmHouseMs. Lofgren, Zoe moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
06/05/2008HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 439.
06/05/2008HouseReported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 110-696.
05/14/2008HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
05/14/2008HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/13/2008HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security
05/13/2008HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security
05/06/2008HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security
05/02/2008HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/01/2008HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
05/01/2008HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 05/01/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 05/01/2008
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 05/01/2008

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary05/01/2008 Referred to
05/14/2008 Markup by
06/05/2008 Reported by H. Rept. 110-696
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security05/02/2008 Referred to
05/13/2008 Markup by
05/13/2008 Reported by
Senate Judiciary06/10/2008 Referred to
07/30/2008 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.5938.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.5938. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 110-326 (09/26/2008)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the Senate on July 30, 2008. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Title I: Former Vice President Protection Act - Former Vice President Protection Act of 2008 - Amends the federal criminal code to provide secret service protection to former Vice Presidents, their spouses, and their children under 16 years of age for up to six months after a former Vice President leaves office. Authorizes the Secretary of Homeland Security to direct the Secret Service to provide temporary protection to former Vice Presidents and their family members at any time thereafter if warranted. Extends such protection to any Vice President holding office on or after the enactment of this Act.

Title II: Identity Theft Enforcement and Restitution Act - Identity Theft Enforcement and Restitution Act of 2008 - Amends the federal criminal code to: (1) authorize criminal restitution orders in identity theft cases to compensate victims for the time spent to remediate the intended or actual harm incurred; (2) allow prosecution of computer fraud offenses for conduct not involving an interstate or foreign communication; (3) eliminate the requirement that damage to a victim's computer aggregate at least $5,000 before a prosecution can be brought for unauthorized access to a computer; (4) make it a felony, during any one-year period, to damage 10 or more protected computers used by or for the federal government or a financial institution; (5) expand the definition of "cyber-extortion" to include a demand for money in relation to damage to a protected computer, where such damage was caused to facilitate the extortion; (6) prohibit conspiracies to commit computer fraud; (7) expand interstate and foreign jurisdiction for prosecution of computer fraud offenses; and (8) impose criminal and civil forfeitures of property used to commit computer fraud offenses.

Directs the U.S. Sentencing Commission to review its guidelines and policy statements for the sentencing of persons convicted of identity theft, computer fraud, illegal wiretapping, and unlawful access to stored information to reflect the intent of Congress that penalties for such offenses be increased. Sets forth criteria for updating such guidelines and policy statements.