Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 01/19/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 01/24/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 01/24/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/24/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 01/24/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 02/06/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/14/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 02/14/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 03/23/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/01/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 11/01/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 11/07/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 11/15/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 12/13/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 12/18/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/11/2008
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/12/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/13/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/08/2008
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/22/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 04/22/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/29/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/29/2008
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 04/30/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/30/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/08/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 05/21/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/23/2008
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/23/2008
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/23/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 06/23/2008