There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to provide veterans for presumptions of service connection for purposes of benefits under laws administered by Secretary of Veterans Affairs for diseases associated with service in the Armed Forces and exposure to biological, chemical, or other toxic agents as part of Project 112, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/01/2008Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
06/12/2008Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs
05/23/2008Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
05/09/2008Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/01/2008Referred to House Armed Services
Action By: House of Representatives
05/01/2008Referred to House Veterans' Affairs
Action By: House of Representatives
05/01/2008Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/01/2008Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (68)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 05/01/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/05/2008
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/15/2008
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/15/2008
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 05/15/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/19/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 05/19/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/19/2008
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/19/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/19/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/19/2008
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/19/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/19/2008
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/19/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/19/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/19/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/20/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/20/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/20/2008
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/20/2008
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 05/20/2008
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/20/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 05/20/2008
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 05/21/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/22/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/03/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/03/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/03/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 06/04/2008
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 06/04/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/05/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/09/2008
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 06/09/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 06/09/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/09/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/09/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/09/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/09/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/09/2008
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/09/2008
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 06/09/2008
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/09/2008
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 06/09/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/09/2008
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/10/2008
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/11/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/18/2008
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/18/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/18/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/26/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 07/08/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/08/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/08/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/08/2008
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/08/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/10/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 07/10/2008
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 07/14/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 07/14/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/16/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 07/16/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/23/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 07/24/2008
Rep. Cazayoux, Donald J., Jr. [D-LA-6] 07/29/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/31/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/11/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/16/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/29/2008

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs05/01/2008 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs05/09/2008 Referred to
06/12/2008 Hearings by
House Armed Services05/01/2008 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel05/23/2008 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5954.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5954. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/01/2008)

Creates, for veterans who were subjected to certain chemical or biological warfare testing involving Project 112 conducted through Deseret Test Center (including the Shipboard Hazard and Defense Project, also known as Project SHAD), a presumption that a disease was incurred in or aggravated by service, notwithstanding that there is no record of evidence of the disease during the period of service, if the disease warrants presumtion of service connection by reason of increased exposure to a biological, chemical, or other toxic agent.