Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 05/01/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/05/2008
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/15/2008
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/15/2008
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 05/15/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/19/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 05/19/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/19/2008
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/19/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/19/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/19/2008
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/19/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/19/2008
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/19/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/19/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/19/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/20/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/20/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/20/2008
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/20/2008
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 05/20/2008
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/20/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 05/20/2008
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 05/21/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/22/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/03/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/03/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/03/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 06/04/2008
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 06/04/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/05/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/09/2008
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 06/09/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 06/09/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/09/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/09/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/09/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/09/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/09/2008
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/09/2008
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 06/09/2008
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/09/2008
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 06/09/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/09/2008
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/10/2008
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/11/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/18/2008
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/18/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/18/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/26/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 07/08/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/08/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/08/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/08/2008
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/08/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/10/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 07/10/2008
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 07/14/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 07/14/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/16/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 07/16/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/23/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 07/24/2008
Rep. Cazayoux, Donald J., Jr. [D-LA-6] 07/29/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/31/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/11/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/16/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/29/2008