Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 05/05/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 05/06/2008
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 05/06/2008
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 05/06/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/06/2008
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 05/06/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/07/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/07/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/08/2008
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 05/13/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/14/2008