Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/06/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/14/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/03/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/14/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/17/2008