Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 05/06/2008
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8]* 05/06/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/08/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/20/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/20/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/20/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/20/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/09/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 06/09/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/15/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/15/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/31/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/31/2008
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 08/01/2008
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 08/01/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/22/2008

Show cosponsors who withdrew