Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 05/07/2008
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 05/20/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/12/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/12/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/10/2008
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/26/2008