Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 01/04/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 01/04/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 01/11/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 01/11/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 01/11/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 01/11/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 01/11/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 01/11/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 01/11/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 01/11/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 01/11/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 01/11/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 01/11/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 01/11/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 01/11/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 01/11/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 01/11/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 01/11/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 01/11/2007
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 01/11/2007
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 01/11/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 01/11/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 01/11/2007
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 01/11/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/11/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/11/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 01/11/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 01/11/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 01/11/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 01/11/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/11/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 01/11/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 01/11/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 01/11/2007
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 01/11/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 01/12/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 01/12/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 01/22/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 01/22/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 01/22/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/22/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 01/22/2007
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 02/08/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 02/08/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 02/27/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 02/27/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/08/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 07/10/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 10/03/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 11/06/2007