Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/29/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/29/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/29/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/29/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/29/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/29/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/29/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/29/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/29/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 04/20/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/20/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/20/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/20/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/20/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/26/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 04/26/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 05/02/2007
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/02/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/02/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/02/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 05/02/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 05/02/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/02/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/02/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/02/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/22/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/24/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/14/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/19/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/21/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/28/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/11/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/12/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/17/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 07/17/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 07/19/2007
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 07/24/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/27/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 08/01/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 08/01/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 08/01/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 08/02/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 08/02/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 08/02/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/04/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 09/07/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/10/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 09/20/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/24/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/26/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 10/23/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/31/2008