Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 05/12/2008
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 05/12/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 05/12/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 05/12/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 05/12/2008
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 05/12/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/12/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 05/12/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1]* 05/12/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 05/12/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 05/12/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 05/12/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 05/12/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 05/12/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 05/12/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 05/12/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 05/12/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/12/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 05/12/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 05/12/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 05/12/2008
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 05/12/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/12/2008
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 05/12/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 05/12/2008
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 05/12/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/15/2008
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/15/2008
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/19/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/19/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/21/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 05/21/2008
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 05/22/2008
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 05/22/2008
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 05/22/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/05/2008
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 09/16/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 09/16/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/16/2008