Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 05/13/2008
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/14/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/15/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/15/2008
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 05/15/2008
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 05/15/2008
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 05/15/2008
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/15/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/15/2008
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/15/2008
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/15/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 05/15/2008
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 05/15/2008
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/15/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/15/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/15/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/15/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 05/15/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 05/15/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/15/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 05/15/2008
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 05/15/2008
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 05/15/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 05/15/2008
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 05/15/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 05/15/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/15/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/15/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 05/15/2008
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 05/15/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 05/15/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/15/2008
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/15/2008
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/15/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/15/2008
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/15/2008
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 05/15/2008
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 05/21/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 05/21/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/21/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/21/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/21/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/21/2008
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 05/21/2008
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/21/2008
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 05/21/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/21/2008
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/21/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 05/21/2008
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 05/21/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/21/2008
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/21/2008
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 05/21/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/21/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/21/2008
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/21/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 05/21/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 05/21/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 05/21/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/21/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/21/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/21/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/21/2008
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/21/2008
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/21/2008
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 05/21/2008
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/21/2008
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 05/21/2008
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/21/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 05/21/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/21/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 05/21/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 05/21/2008
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/21/2008
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 05/22/2008
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 05/22/2008
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/22/2008
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 05/22/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/22/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/22/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/22/2008
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 05/22/2008
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 05/22/2008
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 05/22/2008
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 05/22/2008
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/22/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/22/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 05/22/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/22/2008
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 05/22/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/22/2008
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/22/2008
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/03/2008
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 06/03/2008
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 06/03/2008
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 06/03/2008
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/03/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/03/2008
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 06/03/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 06/03/2008
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/03/2008
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/03/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/03/2008
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 06/03/2008
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 06/03/2008
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 06/03/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/03/2008
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 06/03/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/03/2008
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 06/03/2008
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 06/04/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/04/2008
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 06/04/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/05/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 06/05/2008
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 06/05/2008
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/05/2008