Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/15/2008
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/15/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/21/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/04/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 06/04/2008
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 06/24/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/24/2008