Text: H.R.6041 — 110th Congress (2007-2008)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Reported in House (07/31/2008)

Union Calendar No. 528

110th CONGRESS
2d Session
H. R. 6041

[Report No. 110–814]


To redesignate the Rio Grande American Canal in El Paso, Texas, as the “Travis C. Johnson Canal”.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
May 13, 2008

Mr. Reyes (for himself, Ms. Eddie Bernice Johnson of Texas, Mr. Hinojosa, Mr. Cuellar, Mr. Hall of Texas, Mr. Edwards, Ms. Jackson-Lee of Texas, Mr. Smith of Texas, Mr. Gonzalez, Mr. Gene Green of Texas, Mr. Doggett, Mr. Ortiz, Mr. Carter, Mr. Brady of Texas, Mr. Sessions, Mr. Marchant, Ms. Granger, Mr. Al Green of Texas, Mr. Poe, Mr. Conaway, and Mr. Sam Johnson of Texas) introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Natural Resources

July 31, 2008

Deleted sponsors: Mr. Carter (added May 13, 2008; deleted June 19, 2008), Mr. Brady of Texas (added May 13, 2008; deleted June 20, 2008), Mr. Sessions (added May 13, 2008; deleted June 19, 2008), Mr. Marchant (added May 13, 2008; deleted June 19, 2008), Ms. Granger (added May 13, 2008; deleted June 19, 2008), Mr. Poe (added May 13, 2008; deleted June 23, 2008), Mr. Conaway (added May 13, 2008; deleted June 19, 2008), and Mr. Sam Johnson of Texas (added May 13, 2008; deleted May 21, 2008)

July 31, 2008

Committed to the Committee of the Whole House on the State of the Union and ordered to be printed


A BILL

To redesignate the Rio Grande American Canal in El Paso, Texas, as the “Travis C. Johnson Canal”.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Redesignation.

The canal located in El Paso, Texas, constructed as part of the Rio Grande canalization project under the Act entitled “An Act authorizing construction, operation, and maintenance of Rio Grande canalization project and authorizing appropriation for that purpose”, approved June 4, 1936 (49 Stat. 1463), and known as the “Rio Grande American Canal” shall be redesignated and known as the “Travis C. Johnson Canal”.

SEC. 2. References.

Any reference in a law, map, regulation, document, paper, or other record of the United States to the canal referred to in section 1 shall be deemed to be a reference to the “Travis C. Johnson Canal”.


Union Calendar No. 528

110th CONGRESS
     2d Session
H. R. 6041
[Report No. 110–814]

A BILL
To redesignate the Rio Grande American Canal in El Paso, Texas, as the “Travis C. Johnson Canal”.

July 31, 2008
Committed to the Committee of the Whole House on the State of the Union and ordered to be printed