There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Servicemembers Civil Relief Act to provide for the protection of child custody arrangements for parents who are members of the Armed Forces deployed in support of a contingency operation.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
05/20/2008Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4202-4203)
05/14/2008Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date Chamber
05/21/2008SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
05/20/2008-3:15pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/20/2008-3:15pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4202-4203)
05/20/2008-2:54pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6048.
05/20/2008-2:54pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4202-4206)
05/20/2008-2:54pmHouseMr. Filner moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
05/14/2008HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
05/14/2008HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (58)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/15/2008
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/15/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/15/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/15/2008
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/15/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/15/2008
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 05/15/2008
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/15/2008
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/15/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 05/15/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 05/15/2008
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/15/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/15/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/15/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 05/15/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 05/15/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/15/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/15/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/15/2008
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/15/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/15/2008
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/15/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 05/15/2008
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 05/15/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/15/2008
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/15/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 05/15/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/15/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/15/2008
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/15/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/15/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/15/2008
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/15/2008
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 05/15/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 05/15/2008
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 05/15/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/15/2008
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 05/15/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/15/2008
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 05/15/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/15/2008
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 05/15/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/15/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/15/2008
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 05/15/2008
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/15/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/15/2008
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 05/15/2008
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 05/15/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/15/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/15/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 05/15/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/15/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/15/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/15/2008
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 05/19/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/19/2008
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 05/20/2008

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs05/14/2008 Referred to
Senate Veterans' Affairs05/21/2008 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.6048. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (05/20/2008)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Amends the Servicemembers Civil Relief Act to provide for the protection of child custody arrangements for parents who are members deployed in support of a contingency operation. States that if a motion for change of custody of a child of such a member is filed while the member is so deployed, no court may enter an order modifying or amending a previous child custody judgment, except if there is clear and convincing evidence that it is in the best interest of the child. Prohibits any court from considering a member's absence due to deployment, or possible deployment, in support of a contingency operation in determining the best interest of the child.