Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/15/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/15/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/20/2008
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/20/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 05/20/2008
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/04/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/04/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 06/04/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/04/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/04/2008
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/04/2008
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 06/04/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/04/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/04/2008
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/05/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/05/2008
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/05/2008
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/09/2008
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/09/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/09/2008
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/09/2008
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/09/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/09/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 06/09/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/19/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/19/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/19/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/19/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/19/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/19/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 06/19/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/19/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/19/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/19/2008
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 06/26/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/15/2008
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/15/2008
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/15/2008
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 07/24/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/30/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 07/30/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/30/2008