Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/26/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/26/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/26/2008
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/26/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/26/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/15/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/22/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/23/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/29/2008
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/30/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/31/2008
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/08/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/08/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/08/2008
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/08/2008
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/10/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/10/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/10/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/11/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/11/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/11/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/16/2008
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/16/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/16/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/16/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/18/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/18/2008
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 09/18/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/18/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/29/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/29/2008