Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 05/20/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/20/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 05/20/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 05/20/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/20/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/20/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/17/2008
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 06/17/2008
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/26/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 07/17/2008