There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Military Spouses Residency Relief Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Servicemembers Civil Relief Act to guarantee the residency of spouses of military personnel.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/15/2008Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
06/26/2008Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
06/26/2008Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
06/19/2008Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
05/16/2008Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/15/2008Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/15/2008Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (72)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/15/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 05/15/2008
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 05/15/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 05/15/2008
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 05/15/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 05/15/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 05/15/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 06/18/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 06/18/2008
Rep. Cazayoux, Donald J., Jr. [D-LA-6] 09/16/2008
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 09/16/2008
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/16/2008

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs05/15/2008 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity05/16/2008 Referred to
06/19/2008 Hearings by
06/26/2008 Markup by
06/26/2008 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.R.6070.


Subjects (13)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6070. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/15/2008)

Military Spouses Residency Relief Act - Amends the Servicemembers Civil Relief Act to prohibit, for purposes of voting for a federal, state, or local office, deeming a person to have lost a residence or domicile in a state, acquired a residence or domicile in any other state, or become a resident in or of any other state solely because the person is absent from a state because the person is accompanying the person's spouse who is absent from the state in compliance with military or naval orders.

Prohibits a servicemember's spouse from either losing or acquiring a residence or domicile for purposes of taxation because of being absent or present in any U.S. tax jurisdiction solely to be with the servicemember in compliance with the servicemember's military orders if the residence or domicile is the same for the servicemember and the spouse.