Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/22/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 05/22/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/22/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/22/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/22/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/22/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/22/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/22/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/22/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/22/2008
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/22/2008
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 05/22/2008
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 05/22/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/22/2008
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/03/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/03/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 06/03/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/03/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/03/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/03/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/04/2008
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 06/04/2008
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/05/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/09/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/09/2008
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/10/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/10/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/10/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/11/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/12/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/12/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/17/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/17/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/17/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/17/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/18/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/18/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/19/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 06/20/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/26/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/14/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/16/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/16/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/27/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/27/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 12/10/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 12/10/2008