Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 05/15/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/04/2008
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/18/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/18/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/20/2008
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/20/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/20/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/08/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/08/2008
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/14/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/14/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/15/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/17/2008
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/22/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/22/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/22/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/24/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/24/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/29/2008
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 07/31/2008
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 08/01/2008
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/15/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/15/2008