Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/21/2008
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 05/21/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 05/21/2008
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/21/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/21/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/21/2008
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/21/2008
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/21/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/21/2008
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/21/2008
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/21/2008
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/21/2008
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/21/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 05/21/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/21/2008
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 05/21/2008
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 05/21/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/21/2008
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 05/21/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/21/2008
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/21/2008
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 05/21/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/21/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 05/21/2008
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/21/2008
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/21/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 05/21/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/21/2008
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/21/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 05/21/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/21/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/21/2008
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/22/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/03/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/03/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 06/03/2008
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 06/03/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 06/03/2008
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/04/2008
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 06/04/2008
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/05/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/09/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 06/24/2008