Committees: H.R.6098 — 110th Congress (2007-2008)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security05/20/2008 Referred to
06/26/2008 Markup by
07/10/2008 Reported by H. Rept. 110-752
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Intelligence, Information Sharing, and Terrorism Risk Assessment06/02/2008 Referred to
06/11/2008 Markup by
06/11/2008 Reported by
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs07/30/2008 Referred to
09/23/2008 Markup by
09/24/2008 Reported by