Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/21/2008
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/22/2008
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/03/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/03/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/03/2008
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 06/03/2008
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/05/2008
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/05/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/18/2008