There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Paperwork Assistance Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Paperwork Assistance Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To amend title 44, United States Code, to require each agency to include contact information for the agency in its collection of information.

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 44, United States Code, to require each agency to include a contact telephone number in its collection of information.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
07/29/2008Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 394 - 0 (Roll no. 535).(text: CR H7219)
07/28/2008Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government. H. Rept. 110-781.
05/21/2008Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/30/2008SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
07/29/2008-7:11pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
07/29/2008-7:11pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/29/2008-7:11pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 394 - 0 (Roll no. 535). (text: CR H7219)
07/29/2008-7:03pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7268-7269)
07/29/2008-2:28pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
07/29/2008-2:17pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6113.
07/29/2008-2:17pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7218-7220)
07/29/2008-2:17pmHouseMr. Davis (IL) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/28/2008HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 500.
07/28/2008HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government. H. Rept. 110-781.
07/16/2008HouseSubcommittee on Government Management, Organization, and Procurement Discharged.
07/16/2008HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
07/16/2008HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
06/04/2008HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Government Management, Organization, and Procurement.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
05/21/2008HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
05/21/2008HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 07/16/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 07/16/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/16/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/17/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/22/2008

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Oversight and Government Reform05/21/2008 Referred to
07/16/2008 Markup by
07/28/2008 Reported by H. Rept. 110-781
House Oversight and Government Reform Subcommittee on Government Management, Organization, and Procurement06/04/2008 Referred to
07/16/2008 Discharged from
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs07/30/2008 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.6113.


Subjects (12)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.6113. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (07/29/2008)

Paperwork Assistance Act - Requires a federal agency to inform any person receiving a collection of information from the agency of the agency's contact information, including a website and a telephone number, by which a person may obtain a specific contact person responsible for answering questions about the information collection and other information to assist in responding to the information collection.

Requires the Director of the Office of Management and Budget (OMB) to include in the Director's annual report on information policy activities: (1) the status of implementation by agencies of the requirements of this Act; and (2) a description of how each agency has responded to complaints related to the agency's compliance with such requirements.

Makes this Act's contact information requirements applicable to new or revised collections of information approved by the Director beginning one year after enactment.