Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 05/22/2008
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 05/22/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/03/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 06/05/2008
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 06/05/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/12/2008
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 06/24/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/24/2008
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 09/10/2008