Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/25/2008
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/14/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/14/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/15/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/09/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/23/2008