Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 01/22/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 01/22/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 01/22/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 01/22/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 01/22/2007
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 01/22/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 01/31/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 01/31/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 01/31/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 01/31/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 02/05/2007
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 02/16/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 02/16/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 02/16/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 02/27/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 03/09/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/17/2007
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 04/19/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/01/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/07/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/17/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/12/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/15/2007
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 09/19/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 09/26/2007
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 10/03/2007
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 10/04/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 10/10/2007
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 10/10/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 10/15/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 10/16/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 10/17/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 11/01/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 11/05/2007
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 11/09/2007
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 11/09/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/15/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 12/06/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 12/10/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 01/15/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 01/22/2008
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 01/22/2008
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 01/22/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 02/06/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 02/07/2008
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 02/07/2008
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 02/13/2008
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/11/2008
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/10/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/16/2008
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/07/2008
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/19/2008
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 06/17/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/08/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 09/17/2008