Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 06/04/2008
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 06/04/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/04/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 06/04/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 06/04/2008
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 06/04/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/04/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/04/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 06/04/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/04/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 06/04/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 06/04/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 06/04/2008
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 06/04/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/04/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 06/04/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/04/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/04/2008
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 06/04/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 06/04/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 06/04/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 06/04/2008
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 06/04/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 06/04/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2]* 06/04/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 06/04/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 06/04/2008
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 06/04/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 06/04/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 06/04/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 06/04/2008
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 06/04/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 06/04/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 06/04/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 06/04/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 06/04/2008
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 06/04/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 06/04/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 06/04/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 06/04/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 06/04/2008
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 06/04/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/04/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 06/04/2008
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/04/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 06/04/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 06/04/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 06/04/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 06/04/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 06/04/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 06/04/2008
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 06/04/2008
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/05/2008
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/05/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/09/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/09/2008
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/09/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/11/2008
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 06/19/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 06/20/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/25/2008
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 07/08/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/08/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/10/2008
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 07/10/2008
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/22/2008
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 07/22/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/31/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/31/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/09/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/09/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/24/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/02/2008
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 10/02/2008